skip to content

Lee, Howard Hao

CPSO#: 93049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-0088 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Howard Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee ( CPSO# 93049 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
502-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-0088

Business Address:
1924-5959 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa ON  K1C 2N1
Phone Number: (613) 749-5421

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD HAO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2016