skip to content

Lee Chong, Amy Patricia Lee Kwee Lan

CPSO#: 85251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Ave E

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lee Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee Chong ( CPSO# 85251 )

Business Address:
222 Dixon Road
Suite 106
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3S5

Business Address:
586 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: 416 489 3263


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY PATRICIA LEE KWEE LAN LEE CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014