skip to content

Lee, Cheryl Tse-Yan

CPSO#: 95757

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 Park St
Unit 202
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone: (519) 744-8561
Fax: (519) 744-3089 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cheryl Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 95757 )

Business Address:
475 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone Number: (519) 744-8561

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
Suite 207
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 571-0822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL TSE-YAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017