skip to content

Lee, Benjamin Yin-Chiu

CPSO#: 100675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benjamin YC Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee ( CPSO# 100675)

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN YIN-CHIU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Legal Department
Active Date: November 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s):

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On November 24, 2016, Benjamin Yin-Chiu Lee pleaded guilty to dangerous driving contrary to section 249(1a) of the Criminal Code of Canada, and was sentenced to 12 months probation, a conditional discharge and a victim fine surcharge of $100.