skip to content

Lee, Ashley

CPSO#: 98059

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Canada
Phone: 5195081212
Fax: 5195081240
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lee Di Labio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 98059 )
Dr. A. Di Labio ( CPSO# 98706 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone Number: (519) 508-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2015