skip to content

Lee, Andrea King Ying

CPSO#: 97013

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: LHSC University Hosipita Heart Rhythm Program C6 - 339 Windermere Rd London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 17 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Oct 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jul 2017 to 29 Jun 2018
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019