skip to content

Leblanc, Roxanne Carole

CPSO#: 95928

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:31 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROXANNE CAROLE LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018