Leblanc, Marie-Claude (CPSO#: 99386)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 150 rue Saint-Thomas Salaberry-de-Valleyfield, QC J6T 6C1
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2015