skip to content

Leber, Aviva Phyllis

CPSO#: 86259

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 Coxwell Ave, Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: 647 748 0840
Fax: 416 907 9988 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AVIVA PHYLLIS LEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012