skip to content

Leader, Arthur

CPSO#: 25856

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Dec 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Fertility Centre 955 Green Valley Crescent Ottawa, ON K2C3V4
Date Received: 17 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020