skip to content

LeBlanc, Patricia Nicole

CPSO#: 92777

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 2400 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Charles-Antoine Breau and P. Nicole LeBlanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. LeBlanc ( CPSO# 92777 )
Dr. C. Breau ( CPSO# 93732 )

Business Address:
11 Selkirk
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N2
Phone Number: (613) 763-6882

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: P. Nicole LeBlanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA NICOLE LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012