skip to content

Le, Tran Dao-Bich

CPSO#: 91592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Toronto Eye Care - North
2065 Finch Avenue West - Suite 400
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: 416-748-2020
Fax: 416-748-8582 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Toronto Eye Surgery Centre
2 Champagne Drive, Unit C2
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-792-3043
Fax: 416-748-8582
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Eye Care - North York
7 Elmwood Ave
North York ON  M2N 6R6
Canada
Phone: 647-351-4393
Fax: 416-748-8582
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Uptown Eye Specialists
2180 Steeles Ave West, Suite 221
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Canada
Phone: 416-285-3666 Ext. 4315
Fax: 416-285-3764
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tran Le and Dr. Eric Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 86310 )
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 91592 )

Business Address:
400-2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
C2-2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: (416) 792-3043

Business Address:
3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: 416-285-3666

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Business Address:
7 Elmwood Avenue
North York ON  M2N 6R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRAN DAO-BICH LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014