skip to content

Le Riche, Nicole Georgina Harding

CPSO#: 30491

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services Limited Records Management 100 Picadilly Street London ON N6A 1R8 Phone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 20 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2015