skip to content

Le, Lan Bao

CPSO#: 100198

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 08 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3378 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lan Bao Le Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Le ( CPSO# 100198)

Business Address:
Southmount Healthcare Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3378

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2019