skip to content

Le Francois, Tina Irene

CPSO#: 86542

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Big Thunder Orthopedics
Suite 206
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 344-1123
Fax: (807) 344-1166 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Canada
Phone: (807) 223-8201
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Riverside Health Care
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Canada
Phone: 807-274-3266
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Le Francois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le Francois ( CPSO# 86542 )

Business Address:
984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-1123

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
10 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TINA IRENE LE FRANCOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FRANCOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012