skip to content

Le, De Quang

CPSO#: 65014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 544-9922
Fax: (905) 544-5825 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: De Le Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Le ( CPSO# 65014 )

Business Address:
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 544-9922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DE QUANG LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993