skip to content

Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca

CPSO#: 32257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Mason, Patricia Francesca (used until: 12 Jul 2009 )     Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca (used until: 21 Apr 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
Various Locations
Head office
1 Yorkdale Road, Suite 209. Toronto
Toronto ON  M6A 3A1
Phone: 416 440-4040 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA FRANCESCA LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009