skip to content

Lazare, Kimberly Debra

CPSO#: 98120

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
North York General Hospital, 4South
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6980
Fax: 416-756-6979 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kimberly Lazare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lazare ( CPSO# 98120 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
North York General Hospital
Unit 4 South
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6980

Business Address:
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5
Phone Number: (800) 387-6198

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY DEBRA LAZARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZARE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Dec 2014 to 24 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014