skip to content

Lazar, Neil Marshall

CPSO#: 31973

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Lazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital University Health Network 585 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 14 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019