skip to content

Lawson, Maia Gwendolyn Mamen

CPSO#: 95582

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Center
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Bastianelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bastianelli ( CPSO# 95349 )
Dr. M. Lawson ( CPSO# 95582 )

Business Address:
205-2148 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1

Business Address:
206 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-1912

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
3rd Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 738-8537

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8575

Business Address:
1285 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6K9
Phone Number: (613) 733-8400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAIA GWENDOLYN MAMEN LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013