skip to content

Lawson, Keith Anthony

CPSO#: 100525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Urology Residency Program
Division of Urology
Room 503G
149 College St.
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: 416-946-7983 Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEITH ANTHONY LAWSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LAWSON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LAWSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAWSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LAWSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LAWSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LAWSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020