Lawson, Glasine Ortenza (CPSO#: 90002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Nov 2008

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.O. Lawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Nov 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2010

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Glasine  Ortenza  Lawson  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Obstetrics and Gynaecology, only.