Lawrence, Elizabeth Lucia (CPSO#: 90662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 Clergy Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone: (613) 542-7858
Fax: (613) 544-9795
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.L. Lawrence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lawrence ( CPSO# 90662 )

Business Address:
Maple Family Health Team
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone Number: (613) 542-7858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LUCIA LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011