skip to content

Lawlor, Raymond Laurence

CPSO#: 98088

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 29951 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 374-1686
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.L. Lawlor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lawlor ( CPSO# 98088 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (647) 968-3824

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYMOND LAURENCE LAWLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017