skip to content

Law, Lorraine To

CPSO#: 85537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Intensive Care Unit
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lorraine Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Law ( CPSO# 85537 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network - General Campus
Critical Care Unit
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: 4164382911

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
Intensive Care Unit
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORRAINE TO LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Sep 2006 to 22 Oct 2006
EL - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008