skip to content

Lavigne, Mikael Jacob Katz

CPSO#: 88673

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Katz-Lavigne, Mikhael Jacob (used until: 13 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 369
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Fax: (647) 689-6239 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Family Medicine Centre
Suite 201
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-7396
Fax: (416) 494-0129
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Your Kids Heart Clinic
Suite 409
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIKAEL JACOB KATZ LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012