skip to content

Lavigne, Andrew David

CPSO#: 92818

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 501
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-726-7427
Fax: 705-725-7313 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

C-41 Commerce Park Dr
Barrie ON  L4N 8X1
Canada
Phone: 7057924278
Fax: 7055034277
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lavigne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92818 )
Dr. M. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92846 )

Business Address:
1 Georgian Drive
Room J106A
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9
Phone Number: (705) 792-4278

Business Address:
Unit 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Business Address:
Strive Sport & Exercise Medicine
Unit C
41 Commerce Park Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 8X1
Phone Number: (705) 792-4278

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015