skip to content

Lavi, Ronit

CPSO#: 87344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Dept of Anaesthesia and Periop Med
Room C3 123
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3270 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronit Lavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lavi ( CPSO# 87344 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia and Periop Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3270


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active
             Dr. Ronit Lavi may practise medicine independently in Anaesthesiology.