Laussen, Peter Charles (CPSO#: 99358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6860
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
USA - Massachusetts

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Peter Charles Laussen may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Laussen holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Laussen no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.