skip to content

Laureyns, Griet Christiane Rosa

CPSO#: 88055

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 10 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009