skip to content

Laughton, Angela Faith

CPSO#: 86345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Box 230, General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 1L6
Phone: 6137378222 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Melrose FHT
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4334
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Laughton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laughton ( CPSO# 86345 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 760-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA FAITH LAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009