skip to content

Laufer, Nathan

CPSO#: 30213

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1983