skip to content

Lau, Sally Chui Mei

CPSO#: 105471

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
EL - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2021