skip to content

Lau, Rick Lichi

CPSO#: 90107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
675 Queen St. South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0623
Fax: (519) 603-0625 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rick Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lau ( CPSO# 90107 )

Business Address:
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICK LICHI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011