skip to content

Lau, Pamela Pek-Shan

CPSO#: 95756

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lau, Pamela Pekshan (used until: 21 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Markham Medical Centre
9980 Kennedy Road, Suite 9
Markham ON  L6C 0M4
Phone: 905-888-7099
Fax: 905-888-7098 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau ( CPSO# 95756 )

Business Address:
North Markham Medical Centre
Suite C9
9980 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L6C 0M4
Phone Number: (905) 888-7099

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA PEK-SHAN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013