skip to content

Lau, Anita Sum-Yee

CPSO#: 84935

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: 613-738-4885 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lau ( CPSO# 84935 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANITA SUM-YEE LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008