skip to content

Lau, Ambrose Kaiting

CPSO#: 85844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5109
Fax: (416) 603-5013 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Tuberculosis Clinic
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2673
Fax: (416) 864-3027
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Agincourt Pulmonary Services
Suite 208
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBROSE KAITING LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2007 to 31 Jan 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009