skip to content

Lau, Adrian Ngar Chun

CPSO#: 86794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
4th floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-2663
Fax: 416-323-6484 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
North Building
7/F, Room 7N718A
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4609
Fax: (416) 340-3750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6013
Fax: 416-323-6534
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIAN NGAR CHUN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013