skip to content

Latour, Anne Helen

CPSO#: 24453

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Nov 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lewandowski, Anne Helen Latour (used until: 11 Jan 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997