skip to content

Latchford, Kevin Jason

CPSO#: 89189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Latchford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Latchford ( CPSO# 89189 )

Business Address:
800-55 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON  N2G 4W1
Phone Number: 2269894001

Business Address:
835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN JASON LATCHFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATCHFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
EL - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010