skip to content

Laslo, Britta Camilla Claire

CPSO#: 95372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 777-3837
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Laslo ( CPSO# 95372 )

Business Address:
Locke St. Medical Clinic
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Phone Number: (905) 570-0440

Business Address:
St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Phone Number: (905) 388-0448

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRITTA CAMILLA CLAIRE LASLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013