skip to content

Laroye, Guy Jean

CPSO#: 22926

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:Ghent University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mills Memorial Hospital Department of Anatomic Pathology 4720 Haugland Ave Terrace, BC V8G 2W7
Date Received: 10 May 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018