skip to content

Larouche, Jeremie Stephane

CPSO#: 91078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
MG375
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6775
Fax: 416-480-5990 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremie Larouche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Larouche ( CPSO# 91078 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
MG 375
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6775


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMIE STEPHANE LAROUCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROUCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014