skip to content

Larche, Margaret Jean

CPSO#: 86015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Mar 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 702
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-0489
Fax: (905) 528-0450 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75382
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Larche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Larche ( CPSO# 86015 )

Business Address:
702-25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-0489

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:13 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:13 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016 Active
 Dr.  Margaret  Jean  Larche may practise medicine independently in rheumatology
            and clinical immunology and allergy.