skip to content

Laratta, Cheryl Roberta

CPSO#: 99962

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lane, Cheryl Roberta (used until: 17 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 08 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2016