Gizzi, Lara Sonia Maria (CPSO#: 105070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing FHC
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-0100
Fax: 613-258-6171
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd.
Kemptville ON  K0G1J0
Canada
Phone: 613-258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Winchester District Memorial
Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C2K0
Canada
Phone: 613-774-2429
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gizzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gizzi ( CPSO# 105070)

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Ottawa ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA SONIA MARIA GIZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIZZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017