skip to content

Lapena, Hilario Samson

CPSO#: 85736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cebuano, English, Tagalog, Visayan

Education: University of The East Philippines, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON  M1G 3H1
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: 1-877-718-0285 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Canada
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: 1-877-718-0285
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Canada
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: 1-877-718-0285
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elsa Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )

Business Address:
1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Phone Number: 9058370777


Corporation Name: Dr. Hilario Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6895

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HILARIO SAMSON LAPENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2008