skip to content

Lannigan, Robert

CPSO#: 31719

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Middlesex-London Health Unit STI Clinic 50 King Street London, ON N6A 5L7
Date Received: 03 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective:23 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016