skip to content

Lanigan, Michael William

CPSO#: 29014

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 1984