skip to content

Lane, Sophia

CPSO#: 101173

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON
M5G 1X8
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416)813-7445
Fax: (416)813-7543 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOPHIA LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018